Robert Rietbroek
Full Name |
Robert Rietbroek |
|
Email address |
This email address is being protected from spambots. You need JavaScript enabled to view it.This email address is being protected from spambots. You need JavaScript enabled to view it. |
|
Most important academic position |
President International Business School The Hague |
|
Resume |
Please login or register. This download is available for registered users only. |
|
ECBE mandates |
Start date |
End date |
Reviewer |
26/05/2012 | 13/01/2019 |
Director |
26/05/2012 |
27/05/2017 |
Commissioner | 26/05/2012 | 13/01/2019 |
Commissioner |
14/01/2019 |
28/01/2020 |
Chair of the Board of Commissioners |
14/01/2019 |
28/01/2020 |
Review visits |
Mendel University (2018) |
|
When "26/05/2012" is mentioned as a starting date of a mandate, it means that the officer was appointed at the start of the Agency. The Agency took the form of an "aisbl" (international non-profit) at that date. Most probably, the officer served already earlier at the previous ECBE, but this information is currently not published. |