The Board of Commissioners (BoC)
The Board of Commissioners
The BoC has the judicial power to decide on the requests for accreditation based on evidence, including the report of the review team, the mandatory documents submitted by the institution and any additional documentation.
- The BoC can decide to delegate the in-depth research to one (1) or more Commissioners, who will then submit their analysis to the complete BoC. Anyway, the final decision should be taken by the complete BoC;
- The BoC is informed about the evaluation made by the Reviewers of the Annual Programme Report of accredited Members, and takes action if necessary.
- Any decision-taking about a Members’ accreditation is taken only by the BoC. However, the communication of the decision to the Member seeking accreditation shall be done by the Director of Accreditation (DoA).
- To advise and propose adaptations regarding the accreditation criteria or procedures to the DoA.
The BoC is composed of a minimum of three and a maximum of five members. Commissioners are appointed by the BoD for a period of maximum 3 years and their mandate is renewable.
The Chair of the Board of Commissioners
The Commissioners elect between them a chairperson, also called “Chairperson of the Commissioners” (CoC).
S/he:
- Organizes all activities of the Commissioners;
- Chairs the BoC;
- Is responsible (controls) that the costs made by the Commissioners are within the budget agreed upon by the BoD;
- Proposes candidates to be Commissioners;
- Makes sure all procedures of the Agency are followed by the Commissioners;
- Explains the decisions on accreditation issues taken by the Board of Commissioners;
- Writes the official report about the accreditation request of Members which will be published on the Agency’s website;
- Makes sure all files and reports about any accreditation, and the minutes of the meetings of the BoC are kept at the registered office of the Agency, or at any other place decided on by the BoD.
- Prepares an annual report to the AGM on all accreditation reviews taken place over the last year.
S/he reports to the BoD.
S/he is ex-officio a non-voting member of the BoD.
Currently, the Board of Commissioners is chaired by Vacancy.
Following officers are appointed as Commissioners:
- Natalia Antonova (member BoC since 15/01/2020, mandate ends 14/01/2023)
- Vacancy
- Sebastián Bruque (member BoC since 15/01/2020, mandate ends 14/01/2023)
- Perry Haan, Vice-Chair (member BoC since 14/01/2019, mandate ends 13/01/2022)
Previous BoC mandates:
- Vladimir Kureshov: (26/05/2012 → 14/01/2019)
- Robert Johnson: (26/05/2012 → 14/01/2019)
- Robert Rietbroek: (26/05/2012 → 28/01/2020)
- Samo Bobek: (14/01/2019 → 13/01/2022)
When "26/05/2012" is mentioned as a starting date of a mandate, it means that the officer was appointed at the start of the Agency. The Agency took the form of an "aisbl" (international non-profit) at that date.
Most probably, the officer served already earlier at the previous ECBE, but this information is currently not published.