Véronique Sournies
Coming soon.
Full Name |
Véronique Sournies |
|
Email address |
This email address is being protected from spambots. You need JavaScript enabled to view it. | |
Most important academic position |
|
|
Resume |
Please login or register. This download is available for registered users only. |
|
ECBE mandates |
Start date |
End date |
Director (voting) |
26/05/2012 | 21/05/2016 |
Member of the Committee of Appeal [co-opted] | 22/10/2019 | 15/12/2020 |
Member of the Committee of Appeal [co-opted] |
15/12/2020 |
14/12/2021 |
Member of the Committee of Appeal | 14/12/2021 | AGM 2024 |
When "26/05/2012" is mentioned as a starting date of a mandate, it means that the officer was appointed at the start of the Agency. The Agency took the form of an "aisbl" (international non-profit) at that date. Most probably, the officer served already earlier at the previous ECBE, but this information is currently not published. |